TN HB2721 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
Pending: House Cities & Counties Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
Pending: House Cities & Counties Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Parental Oversight of Public Libraries Act." - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 10.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Parental Oversight of Public Libraries Act." - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 10.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee to Final Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee to 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2896 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0