TN SB0132 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-11 - Re-ref. to S. H&W Comm.
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-11 - Re-ref. to S. H&W Comm.
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the reduction of Temporary Assistance to Needy Families (TANF) payments for parents or caretakers of TANF recipients whose children fail to maintain satisfactory progress in school. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires the reduction of Temporary Assistance to Needy Families (TANF) payments for parents or caretakers of TANF recipients whose children fail to maintain satisfactory progress in school. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Re-ref. to S. H&W Comm. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0270) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/4/2013 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Action Def. in S. H&W Comm. to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0261 (Crossfiled) 2013-07-11 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee