TN SB0132 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the bureau of TennCare within the department of finance and administration to June 30, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 10 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the bureau of TennCare within the department of finance and administration to June 30, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 10 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 493
2019-04-24SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/24/2019
2019-04-10SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0471 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 493

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback