TN SB0265 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 417
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 417
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a Class D felony offense for entity or person who knowingly uses a communication or electronic device to obtain information concerning an elderly adult's medical condition or health, sends unsolicited or specifically refused medical supplies to the elderly adult, and files a claim or submits a bill with the state Medicare plan for reimbursement. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 5 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, creates a Class D felony offense for entity or person who knowingly uses a communication or electronic device to obtain information concerning an elderly adult's medical condition or health, sends unsolicited or specifically refused medical supplies to the elderly adult, and files a claim or submits a bill with the state Medicare plan for reimbursement. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 5 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 417 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0257 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 417