TN SB0773 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from October 1 to October 31 of each year the date by which the department of labor and workforce development must provide data on the state's anticipated workforce needs and other information to the commission. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7 and Title 49, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, changes from October 1 to October 31 of each year the date by which the department of labor and workforce development must provide data on the state's anticipated workforce needs and other information to the commission. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7 and Title 49, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1310 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee