TN SB1162 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of community and economic development to study the effectiveness of municipal and regional planning activity for economic development and to report to the general assembly by January 15, 2010. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of community and economic development to study the effectiveness of municipal and regional planning activity for economic development and to report to the general assembly by January 15, 2010. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 66 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Lowe Finney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-03-31 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/7/2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1950 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1162&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1162.pdf |