TN SB1297 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes an insurer that offers a health benefit plan to deliver notices and documents related to health, vision, and dental coverage electronically to its insureds with consent. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 56 and Title 71, relative to paperless electronic communications.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur Amend# 1 by Bailey (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/23 | |
2023-04-18 | Pub. Ch. 104 | |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-03-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0045) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 3/13/2023 |
2023-03-06 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2023-03-06 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0045) |
2023-03-06 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-03-02 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0887 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 104