TN SB1526 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises Financial Management Modernization System of the County of Sumner, Tennessee of 2012, also known as the 2012 Finance Act, as it relates to participation of the county school system under the Act. - Amends Chapter 70 of the Private Acts of 2012.
Title
As introduced, revises Financial Management Modernization System of the County of Sumner, Tennessee of 2012, also known as the 2012 Finance Act, as it relates to participation of the county school system under the Act. - Amends Chapter 70 of the Private Acts of 2012.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 8 | |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1517 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pr. Ch. 8