TN SB1727 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the Physician Assistant (PA) Licensure Compact. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63 and Title 68, relative to physician assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0562) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 3 for 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2024-04-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0562) |
2024-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-01 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0513) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 1/31/2024 |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1862 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.