TN SB1840 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a pilot program for five years to allow private entities to provide foster care services to qualifying children; requires the department of children's services to create a process for selecting children for the program; directs the pilot program to submit monthly reports to the state foster care review board; requires the comptroller to audit the program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 36 and Title 37, relative to foster care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1815 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee