TN SB2133 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, declares that an intrastate commercial good that is produced in this state and that remains within the borders of this state is not subject to federal law or federal regulation under the authority of congress to regulate interstate commerce. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, relative to goods produced in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Lowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Aye 26, Nay 1, PNV 2 |
2024-04-25 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Cochran, Zachary, Boyd, Shaw) |
2024-04-25 | House | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Stevens, Watson, Taylor, Campbell, Lowe) |
2024-04-25 | House | H. refused to recede from S am. no. 1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in amendment 1 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/25/2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reset on next available senate message calendar |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 3 for 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 18, PNV 0 |
2024-04-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0978) |
2024-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 6 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2479 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.