TN SB2247 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions relative to public assistance. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 1, Part 1; Section 71-3-104; Section 71-3-105; Section 71-5-314 and Section 71-5-316.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions relative to public assistance. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 1, Part 1; Section 71-3-104; Section 71-3-105; Section 71-5-314 and Section 71-5-316.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] |
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY GOINS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 41 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY GOINS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 41 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 789 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 04/20/2018; 12/01/2018 | |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 7, PNV 2 |
2018-04-09 | House | Am. tabled. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1108) |
2018-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0765) |
2018-04-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-26 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 1 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0717) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 3/22/18 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1822 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 789