TN SB2268 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of education to annually collect and report certain information for each provider and nonpublic school that receives public funds through a scholarship, voucher, education savings account, individualized education account, or similar program created to provide parents, guardians, or students state or local funds to assist the parent, guardian, or student in paying tuition, fees, and any other approved expenses associated with the student enrolling in and attending a nonpublic school in this state. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2409 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-06 - Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/12/2024