TN SB2674 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 901
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 901
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a prescriber to provide certain information prior to prescribing more than a three-day supply of an opioid or an opioid dosage that exceeds a total of a 180 morphine milligram equivalent dose to a woman of childbearing age. - Amends TCA Title 53 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, requires a prescriber to provide certain information prior to prescribing more than a three-day supply of an opioid or an opioid dosage that exceeds a total of a 180 morphine milligram equivalent dose to a woman of childbearing age. - Amends TCA Title 53 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 901 | |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2348 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 901