TN SB2880 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 755
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 755
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the state treasurer to enter into agreements with any federal reserve bank, instead of a federal reserve member bank or trust company located in Tennessee, for the purpose of transferring public funds and funds of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system through the facilities of the federal reserve banking system. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-308.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the state treasurer to enter into agreements with any federal reserve bank, instead of a federal reserve member bank or trust company located in Tennessee, for the purpose of transferring public funds and funds of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system through the facilities of the federal reserve banking system. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-308.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 755 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/27/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2088 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 755