TN SB2926 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes a redundant definition in law relative to intoxicating liquors that defines the commission. - Amends TCA Title 57 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57 and Title 67, relative to alcohol.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 9, PNV 6 |
2024-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0848) |
2024-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 0 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0834) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2950 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Comp. SB subst.