TX HB1218 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 536; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 536; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-26HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2013-02-25HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2013-02-25HouseRead first time
2013-02-15HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2013-02-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback