TX HB1782 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Laid on the table subject to call
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Laid on the table subject to call
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Wharton County Drainage District.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Wharton County Drainage District.
Sponsors
Rep. John Zerwas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2009-05-22 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-14 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-02 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time | |
2009-02-25 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2009-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB637 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
HB388 (Same As) 2009-03-18 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
HB388 (Same As) 2009-03-18 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WHARTON COUNTY DRAINAGE DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WHARTON COUNTY DRAINAGE DISTRICT