TX HB181 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of a pilot program for the issuance of digital identification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of a pilot program for the issuance of digital identification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#514 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-18HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-18HouseRecord vote RV#514
2019-04-18HousePassed
2019-04-18HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-18HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-18HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-03-14HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-06HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-02-13HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB991 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback