TX HB2144 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to peace officer instruction on veterans affected by trauma.
Title
Relating to peace officer instruction on veterans affected by trauma.
Sponsors
Rep. John Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Military & Veterans
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
Military & Veterans
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS