TX HB257 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a policy requiring certain public primary and secondary schools to provide local law enforcement agencies certain information regarding certain individuals authorized to carry a handgun on a campus.
Title
Relating to a policy requiring certain public primary and secondary schools to provide local law enforcement agencies certain information regarding certain individuals authorized to carry a handgun on a campus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Law Enforcement
Safety
Weapons
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Law Enforcement
Safety
Weapons