TX HB3866 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the date for the election of directors of the Hill Country Underground Water Conservation District.
Title
Relating to the date for the election of directors of the Hill Country Underground Water Conservation District.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Fraser [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-19 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-05-19 | Read first time | |
2011-05-19 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-19 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-16 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-09 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-09 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2011-05-07 | Filed |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--General
HILL COUNTRY UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Elections--General
HILL COUNTRY UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.