TX HB4186 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a committee to recommend a framework to incorporate digital teaching and learning in public schools.
Title
Relating to the creation of a committee to recommend a framework to incorporate digital teaching and learning in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1235 (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1235 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended 1-Sanford |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2431 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Electronic Information Systems
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
NEXT GENERATION COMMISSION ON DIGITAL LEARNING
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Electronic Information Systems
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
NEXT GENERATION COMMISSION ON DIGITAL LEARNING
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE