TX HB4458 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sources of supply of water for certain municipally owned water utilities.
Title
Relating to the sources of supply of water for certain municipally owned water utilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1583 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4458 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04458I.htm |