TX HB775 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Summary
Relating to the penalty for theft of a central air-conditioning unit.
Title
Relating to the penalty for theft of a central air-conditioning unit.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Al Edwards [D] | Rep. Allen Fletcher [R] |
Rep. David Leibowitz [D] | Rep. Robert Miklos [D] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Chris Turner [D] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-01 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Passed | |
2009-05-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-01 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-22 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-15 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-30 | Withdrawn from schedule | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Withdrawn from schedule | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-25 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-02-25 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-19 | Read first time | |
2009-01-26 | Filed |