TX HCR173 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. No. 1451.
Title
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. No. 1451.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | Adopted | |
2011-05-29 | Read | |
2011-05-29 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | Adopted | |
2011-05-27 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-27 | Filed |
Subjects
Animals
COMMERCIAL DOG & CAT BREEDERS ACT
DOG OR CAT BREEDERS ACT
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Resolutions
Resolutions--Corrective
COMMERCIAL DOG & CAT BREEDERS ACT
DOG OR CAT BREEDERS ACT
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Resolutions
Resolutions--Corrective