TX HCR33 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing opposition to the enactment or enforcement in Texas of a law that automatically suspends the driver's license of an individual who is convicted of any drug-related offense.
Title
Expressing opposition to the enactment or enforcement in Texas of a law that automatically suspends the driver's license of an individual who is convicted of any drug-related offense.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SCR10 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Crimes--Drugs
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HCR33 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HC00033I.htm |