TX HCR73 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of the Honorable James Ray Gayle III of Angleton.
Title
In memory of the Honorable James Ray Gayle III of Angleton.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-04-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-04-05 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-04 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-03-16 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-03-14 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-06 | House | Filed |