TX HR465 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing May 5, 2011, as National Day of Prayer in Texas.
Title
Recognizing May 5, 2011, as National Day of Prayer in Texas.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-12 | Adopted | |
2011-05-12 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-02-16 | Filed |
Subjects
NATIONAL DAY OF PRAYER
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates