TX SB1412 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to accountability intervention provisions applicable to school district campuses, including the creation of accelerated campus excellence turnaround plans and the conditions under which a closed campus may be repurposed to serve students at that campus location.
Title
Relating to accountability intervention provisions applicable to school district campuses, including the creation of accelerated campus excellence turnaround plans and the conditions under which a closed campus may be repurposed to serve students at that campus location.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1657 (Y: 119 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1657 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | House | Amendment withdrawn 4-Bohac |
2019-05-21 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2019-05-21 | House | Amendment(s) offered 4-Bohac |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 3-Rodriguez |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 2-VanDeaver and Huberty |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 1-Burrows |
2019-05-21 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-21 | House | Postponed 5/21/19 5:00 PM |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Watson |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Perry |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special