TX SB1524 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the movement of certain vehicles, including vehicles transporting an intermodal shipping container; authorizing a fee; creating an offense.
Title
Relating to the movement of certain vehicles, including vehicles transporting an intermodal shipping container; authorizing a fee; creating an offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1148 (Y: 83 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Point of order overruled RV#1135 (Y: 80 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1134 (Y: 45 N: 85 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1133 (Y: 52 N: 86 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1132 (Y: 79 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1131 (Y: 89 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - FA3 RodrÃguez (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1148 (Y: 83 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Point of order overruled RV#1135 (Y: 80 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1134 (Y: 45 N: 85 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1133 (Y: 52 N: 86 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1132 (Y: 79 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1131 (Y: 89 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - FA3 RodrÃguez (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Effective on 1/1/18 | |
2017-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-16 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-16 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-12 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-11 | House | Amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-10 | House | Point of order overruled |
2017-05-10 | House | Point of order overruled |
2017-05-10 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-05-10 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-05-10 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-10 | House | Amended |
2017-05-10 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-05-10 | House | Amended |
2017-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-05-10 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-05-10 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | House | Amended |
2017-05-10 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-05-10 | House | Amended |
2017-05-10 | House | Amended |
2017-05-10 | House | Point of order overruled |
2017-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-10 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PERMITS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SHIPPING & SHIPYARDS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
VEHICLE WEIGHT LIMITS & ENFORCEMENT
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
PERMITS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SHIPPING & SHIPYARDS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
VEHICLE WEIGHT LIMITS & ENFORCEMENT
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road