TX SB1686 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-07 - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-07 - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to group health benefits coverage for persons wrongfully imprisoned.
Title
Relating to group health benefits coverage for persons wrongfully imprisoned.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-07 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-26 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Record vote | |
2011-05-26 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-26 | Read | |
2011-05-26 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-19 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-17 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Insurance | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-04-29 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
WRONGFUL IMPRISONMENT
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
WRONGFUL IMPRISONMENT