TX SB297 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to resident tuition rates and fees at public institutions of higher education for certain veterans and servicemembers and their spouses and children.
Title
Relating to resident tuition rates and fees at public institutions of higher education for certain veterans and servicemembers and their spouses and children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-06-01 | Senate discharges conferees-reported | |
2009-06-01 | Record vote | |
2009-06-01 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-06-01 | Senate discharges conferees | |
2009-04-22 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-04-22 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-04-22 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-04-22 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2009-04-16 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-04-16 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-04-16 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-04-15 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-04-15 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2009-04-15 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2009-04-15 | Read | |
2009-04-15 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-08 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-04-08 | Record vote | |
2009-04-08 | Passed | |
2009-04-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-07 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-07 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-04-07 | Record vote | |
2009-04-07 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-04-07 | Amendment amended | |
2009-04-07 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-07 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2009-04-03 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-02 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-25 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-03-24 | Record vote | |
2009-03-24 | Passed | |
2009-03-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-24 | Record vote | |
2009-03-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-03-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-03-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-03-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-02 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-24 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-03-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-19 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-18 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-02-11 | Read first time | |
2009-01-26 | Co-author authorized | |
2008-11-14 | Filed | |
2008-11-14 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB38 (Similar To) 2009-04-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Military & Veterans
RESIDENCY REQUIREMENTS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Military & Veterans
RESIDENCY REQUIREMENTS