TX SB329 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for and the transparency of epidemiological reports and certain immunization exemption information and reports.
Title
Relating to requirements for and the transparency of epidemiological reports and certain immunization exemption information and reports.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3551 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Health
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
IMMUNIZATIONS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Health
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
IMMUNIZATIONS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB329 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00329I.htm |