TX SB496 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to factors the Texas Historical Commission considers in reviewing an application for a grant or loan through the historic courthouse preservation program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to factors the Texas Historical Commission considers in reviewing an application for a grant or loan through the historic courthouse preservation program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1449 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1449
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-17HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-25HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-28SenateFiled
2019-01-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1125 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback