TX SB601 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Veterans Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Veterans Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1974 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1387 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1974
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-22SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-22SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-22HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-22HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2019-05-20HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-20HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-20HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-20SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-20SenateSenate requests conference committee
2019-05-20SenateSenate refuses to concur
2019-05-20SenateRead
2019-05-20SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-15HouseRecord vote RV#1387
2019-05-15HousePassed
2019-05-15HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Paddie
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-08HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2019-04-08HouseRead first time
2019-04-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenatePassed
2019-04-04SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-04SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-04-04SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Menéndez
2019-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-04SenateAmended
2019-04-04SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hall
2019-04-04SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-01SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-26SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2019-02-21SenateRead first time
2019-02-07SenateFiled
2019-02-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1327 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB601
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00601I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00601S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00601E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00601H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00601F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-04-F.PDF#page=42
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB601&RcdVtNo=1387&Ch=H&Dt=05/15/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB601&RcdVtNo=1974&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=18

Bill Comments

feedback