TX SB933 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-29 - Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
Pending: House Government Efficiency & Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-29 - Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
Pending: House Government Efficiency & Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the electronic submission of certain documents to the attorney general and the submission of certain documents by the attorney general; imposing certain fees.
Title
Relating to the electronic submission of certain documents to the attorney general and the submission of certain documents by the attorney general; imposing certain fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | |
2011-04-29 | Read first time | |
2011-04-28 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-28 | Record vote | |
2011-04-28 | Passed | |
2011-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-28 | Record vote | |
2011-04-28 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-28 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-28 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Open Government, Select | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time | |
2011-02-24 | Filed | |
2011-02-24 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Electronic Information Systems
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Open Records
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Electronic Information Systems
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Open Records
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions