TX SCR57 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recalling H.B. No. 2277 from the house for further consideration.
Title
Recalling H.B. No. 2277 from the house for further consideration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-21 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-21 | Adopted | |
2011-05-21 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Adopted | |
2011-05-21 | Read | |
2011-05-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-21 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Insurance
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Life & Annuities
Resolutions
Resolutions--Recall
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Insurance
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Life & Annuities
Resolutions
Resolutions--Recall
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING