US HB1200 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 116-58. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 116-58. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Sec. 2) directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to increase, as of December 1, 2019, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children. The percentage increase in benefits shall be the same as the cost-of-living increase for Social Security recipients. The VA may administratively adjust the rates of disability compensation payable to persons receiving VA benefits who have not received compensation for a service-connected disability or death. (Sec. 3) The bill requires the VA to publish the adjusted rates by a specified date.
Title
Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-58. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-09-26 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-09-18 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5482) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4042) |
2019-05-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1200. |
2019-05-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4042-4043) |
2019-05-21 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 44. |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-68. |
2019-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2072 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6168 (Related) 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-178. (TXT | PDF)
SB4579 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6168 (Related) 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-178. (TXT | PDF)
SB4579 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation