US HB1216 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-25 - Became Public Law No: 113-138.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-25 - Became Public Law No: 113-138.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) Vet Center in Prescott, Arizona, as the "Dr. Cameron McKinley Department of Veterans Affairs Veterans Center."
Title
To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs Vet Center in Prescott, Arizona, as the "Dr. Cameron McKinley Department of Veterans Affairs Veterans Center".
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Ron Barber [D-AZ] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Ed Pastor [D-AZ] | Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-25 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-138. |
2014-07-25 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4364) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2014-06-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-06-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5385-5386) |
2014-06-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1216. |
2014-06-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5385-5387) |
2014-06-17 | House | Mr. Lamborn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-04-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-03-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Arizona
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Veterans' medical care