US HB1586 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
REPEAL HIV Discrimination Act of 2015 Repeal Existing Policies that Encourage and Allow Legal HIV Discrimination Act of 2015 Expresses the sense of Congress that federal and state laws, policies, and regulations regarding people living with HIV/AIDS should: (1) not place unique or additional burdens on such individuals solely as a result of their HIV status; and (2) demonstrate a public health-oriented, evidence-based, medically accurate, and contemporary understanding of HIV transmission, health implications, treatment, and the impact of punitive HIV-specific laws, policies, regulations, and judicial precedents and decisions on public health and on affected people, families, and communities. Directs: (1) the Department of Justice (DOJ), the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS), and the Department of Defense (DOD) to initiate a national review of federal (including military) and state laws, policies, regulations, and judicial precedents and decisions regarding criminal and related civil commitment cases involving people living with HIV/AIDS; and (2) DOJ to transmit to Congress and make publicly available the results of such review with related recommendations. Requires DOJ and HHS to: (1) develop and publicly release guidance and best practice recommendations for states, and (2) establish an integrated monitoring and evaluation system to measure state progress. Directs DOJ, HHS, and DOD to transmit to the President and Congress any proposals necessary to implement adjustments to federal laws, policies, or regulations. Prohibits this Act from being construed to discourage the prosecution of individuals who intentionally transmit or attempt to transmit HIV to another individual.
Title
REPEAL HIV Discrimination Act of 2015 Repeal Existing Policies that Encourage and Allow Legal HIV Discrimination Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2336 (Related) 2015-12-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Defense
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Justice
Disability and health-based discrimination
Government studies and investigations
HIV/AIDS
Intergovernmental relations
Judicial procedure and administration
Military law
State and local government operations
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Defense
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Justice
Disability and health-based discrimination
Government studies and investigations
HIV/AIDS
Intergovernmental relations
Judicial procedure and administration
Military law
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1586/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1586/BILLS-114hr1586ih.pdf |