US HB1651 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fort Sumner Project Title Conveyance Act - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to convey to the Fort Sumner Irrigation District, located in De Baca County, New Mexico, all works, land, and facilities of the Fort Sumner reclamation project in accordance with the Memorandum of Agreement between the United States and the Fort Sumner Irrigation District Concerning Principles and Elements of Proposed Transfer of Title to Fort Sumner Irrigation District Facilities. Requires the Secretary, before carrying out such conveyance, to assure compliance with all applicable requirements under the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969, the Endangered Species Act of 1973, and any other law applicable to the property conveyed. Requires the Secretary to report to Congress if such conveyance isn't completed within two years after such requirements are met. Terminates, on the date of such conveyance: (1) U.S. interest in and responsibility for the project and liability relating to the conveyed property; (2) a specified repayment contract between the United States and the District dated November 5, 1948; and (3) a specified payment obligation of the United States under the contract between the United States and the District for the forbearance of exercising priority water rights, dated August 21, 2009. Provides that all other terms of such forbearance agreement shall remain in effect for not less than 10 years after this Act's enactment. Provides that after conveyance of title under this Act: (1) the conveyed property shall not be considered to be a part of a federal reclamation project; and (2) the entity to which the property is conveyed shall not be eligible to receive any benefits, including federal project power, with respect to the conveyed property, except for benefits that would be available to a similarly situated entity with respect to property that is not part of a federal reclamation project.
Title
Fort Sumner Project Title Conveyance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power. |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB284 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 110.
Subjects
Land transfers
New Mexico
Public contracts and procurement
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
New Mexico
Public contracts and procurement
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1651/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1651/BILLS-113hr1651ih.pdf |