US HB1827 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Terminates (1) the taxpayer election to designate $3 of income tax liability for financing of presidential election campaigns, (2) the Presidential Election Campaign Fund, and (3) the Presidential Primary Matching Payment Account. Of the funds remaining in the Presidential Election Campaign Fund, the Department of the Treasury must transfer $37.8 million to the 10-Year Pediatric Research Initiative Fund. To the extent that funding is provided in advance in appropriations Acts, Treasury must transfer the remainder of the funds to the Department of Education to carry out activities under title II of the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965.
Title
STOP Act Students and Teachers Over Politicians Act
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB290 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2234 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3225 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2234 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3225 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Child health
Education programs funding
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government trust funds
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Research administration and funding
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Education programs funding
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government trust funds
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Research administration and funding
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1827/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1827/BILLS-116hr1827ih.pdf |