US HB1945 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 303.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 303.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tule River Tribe Water Development Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the Commissioner of Reclamation, to complete and report to specified congressional committees on a feasibility study to evaluate alternatives for the provision of a domestic, commercial, municipal, industrial, and irrigation water supply for the Tule River Tribe of the Tule River Reservation, California. Authorizes appropriations.Prohibits any project constructed relating to that study from providing water supply for the casino of the Tule River Tribe or any other tribal casino or any lodging, dining, entertainment, meeting space, parking, or other similar facility in support of a gaming activity.Provides that a water supply provided by a project constructed relating to the feasibility study shall be available to serve: (1) the domestic, municipal, and governmental (including firefighting) needs of the Tribe; and (2) other commercial, agricultural, and industrial needs not related to gaming.
Title
Tule River Tribe Water Development Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 303. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 111-153. | |
2009-12-16 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2009-07-09 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. | |
2009-07-08 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-07-08 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 417 - 3 (Roll no. 482). (text: CR 7/7/2009 H7713-7714) | |
2009-07-08 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7756-7757) | |
2009-07-07 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. Foxx objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2009-07-07 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1945. | |
2009-07-07 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7713-7714) | |
2009-07-07 | Ms. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-04-13 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB789 (Same As) 2009-07-23 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 111-91.
Subjects
California
Government investigations
Indian lands and resources rights
Water resources development
Water use and supply
Government investigations
Indian lands and resources rights
Water resources development
Water use and supply