US HB1945 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fostering Resilience to Terrorism Act of 2013 - Amends the Terrorism Risk Insurance Act of 2002 to revise the definition of an "act of terrorism" to mean any act that is certified as meeting the specified criteria for such an act by the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS), in concurrence with the Secretary of the Treasury (currently, by the Secretary of the Treasury in concurrence with the Secretary of State). Extends the Terrorism Insurance Program until December 31, 2024 (under current law the Program expires on December 31, 2014). Requires reports in 2017, 2020, and 2030 on the findings of the President's Working Group on Financial Markets pursuant to an ongoing analysis regarding the long-term availability and affordability of insurance for terrorism risk. Directs the DHS Secretary to: (1) provide to insureds under the Program, through the Secretary of the Treasury, timely homeland security information, including terrorism risk information, at the appropriate classification level and information on best practices to foster resilience to a terrorist act; and (2) conduct research to determine the extent to which such insureds, particularly insureds in critical infrastructure sectors, incorporate such best practices information into their business operations.
Title
Fostering Resilience to Terrorism Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Ron Barber [D-AZ] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies. |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB508 (Related) 2013-02-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2146 (Related) 2013-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2146 (Related) 2013-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Department of the Treasury
Disaster relief and insurance
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Insurance industry and regulation
Life, casualty, property insurance
Terrorism
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Department of the Treasury
Disaster relief and insurance
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Insurance industry and regulation
Life, casualty, property insurance
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1945/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1945/BILLS-113hr1945ih.pdf |