US HB2210 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 115-47. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 115-47. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the community living center of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Butler Township, Butler County, Pennsylvania, as the "Sergeant Joseph George Kusick VA Community Living Center". (Sec. 2) This bill designates the Department of Veterans Affairs community living center in Butler Township, Butler County, Pennsylvania, as the "Sergeant Joseph George Kusick VA Community Living Center."
Title
To designate the community living center of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Butler Township, Butler County, Pennsylvania, as the "Sergeant Joseph George Kusick VA Community Living Center".
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] |
Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] |
Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 379 (Y: 401 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-47. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-08-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4687) |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2017-07-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-07-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 379). (text: CR H5890) |
2017-07-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5901) |
2017-07-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-07-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2210. |
2017-07-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5890-5892) |
2017-07-17 | House | Mr. Dunn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4986 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Pennsylvania
Veterans' medical care
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Pennsylvania
Veterans' medical care