US HB2402 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-05 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-05 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To transfer administrative jurisdiction of certain Federal lands from the Army Corps of Engineers to the Bureau of Indian Affairs, to take such lands into trust for the Winnebago Tribe of Nebraska, and for other purposes.
Title
Winnebago Land Transfer Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] |
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-06-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB9382 (Related) 2022-12-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2402/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2402/BILLS-117hr2402ih.pdf |