US HB2460 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the provision of adult day health care services for veterans. (Sec. 1) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to enter into an agreement or a contract with each state home to pay for adult day health care for a veteran eligible for, but not receiving, nursing home care. The veteran must need such care either specifically for a service-connected disability, or, if not specifically for one, the veteran must have a service-connected disability rated 70% or more. Payment under each agreement or contract between the VA and a state home must equal 65% of the payment that the VA would otherwise pay to the state home if the veteran were receiving nursing home care.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the provision of adult day health care services for veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-05-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2912) |
2016-05-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2460. |
2016-05-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2912-2913) |
2016-05-23 | House | Mr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-05-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-05-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-29 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2016-04-29 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-05-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-05-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Adult day care
Armed forces and national security
Disability and paralysis
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Disability and paralysis
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Veterans' medical care