US HB265 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Drug Sentencing Reform and Cocaine Kingpin Trafficking Act of 2009 - Amends the Controlled Substances Act and the Controlled Substances Import and Export Act to increase the amount of a controlled substance or mixture containing a cocaine base (i.e., crack cocaine) required for the imposition of mandatory minimum prison terms for crack cocaine trafficking to eliminate the sentencing disparity between crack and powder cocaine.Eliminates the five-year mandatory minimum prison term for first-time possession of crack cocaine. Directs the U.S. Sentencing Commission to review and amend, if appropriate, its sentencing guidelines for trafficking in a controlled substance to reflect the use of a dangerous weapon or violence in such crime and the culpability and the role of the defendant in such crime, taking into account certain aggravating and mitigating factors. Directs the Attorney General to make grants to improve drug treatment to offenders in prisons, jails, and juvenile facilities. Authorizes the Attorney General to make grants to establish demonstration programs to reduce the use of alcohol and other drugs by substance abusers while incarcerated and until the completion of parole or court supervision. Increases monetary penalties for drug trafficking and for the importation and exportation of controlled substances. Authorizes appropriations to the Departments of Justice (DOJ), the Treasury, and Homeland Security (DHS) for FY2009-FY2010 for the prosecution of, and for supporting the prosecution of, high-level drug offenses.
Title
Drug Sentencing Reform and Cocaine Kingpin Trafficking Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-09 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-01-07 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-01-07 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2009-01-07 | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1789 (Related) 2010-08-03 - Became Public Law No: 111-220.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Department of the Treasury
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Executive agency funding and structure
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement administration and funding
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Violent crime
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Department of the Treasury
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Executive agency funding and structure
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement administration and funding
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/265/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr265/BILLS-111hr265ih.pdf |