US HB2789 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Support Startup Businesses Act of 2017
Title
Support Startup Businesses Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2017-06-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2763 (Related) 2017-10-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
SB2419 (Related) 2018-12-21 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-454.
SB2419 (Related) 2018-12-21 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-454.
Subjects
Commerce
Intellectual property
Manufacturing
Marketing and advertising
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Small business
Technology transfer and commercialization
Intellectual property
Manufacturing
Marketing and advertising
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Small business
Technology transfer and commercialization
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2789/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2789/BILLS-115hr2789ih.pdf |